skip to content

Riaz, Sarah

CPSO#: 81069

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Hansen Medical Clinic
Unit 116
284 Queen St EAST
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone: (905) 455-6464
Fax: 905-264-1976 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Riaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2009
Corporation Name: Riaz Rawoot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Riaz ( CPSO# 81069 )
Dr. A. Rawoot ( CPSO# 93298 )

Business Address:
284 Queen Street East
Unit 116
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 455-6464

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH RIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011