skip to content

Pendharkar, Sushama

CPSO#: 32765

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Sep 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital,
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7346
Fax: (905) 804-7970 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pendharkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pendharkar ( CPSO# 32766 )
Dr. S. Pendharkar ( CPSO# 32765 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSHAMA PENDHARKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDHARKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1981