skip to content

Nahvi, Shahab

CPSO#: 95512

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Azar Medical Clinic
267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1M8
Phone: (647) 992-9277
Fax: (416) 250-1919 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shahab Nahvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nahvi ( CPSO# 95512 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Azar Medical Clinic
267 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 1M8
Phone Number: (647) 992-9277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 29 Sep 2021 Active
 As from September 25, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shahab Nahvi in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nahvi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. SHAHAB NAHVI 
("Dr. Nahvi")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 

(2)	I, Dr. Nahvi, certificate of registration number 95512, am a member of the College.
 
(3)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that I am the subject of College investigations bearing File Numbers 1117220 (now CAS129481-C8H1J0)  and 1117174 (now CAS129649-Z5H3W3) (the "Investigations") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct, including inappropriate and aggressive conduct, or potential sexual abuse. I further acknowledge that I have been charged with Administer Noxious Thing under section 245 of the Criminal Code.

(4)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

(5)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an Order at a later date in accordance with the Code.

(6)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Tribunal.

B.	UNDERTAKING 

(7)	I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective September 27, 2021 ("Effective Date").

(8)	Practice Restrictions 

(a)	I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake that I will restrict my practice to Emergency Medicine only, at a hospital where I have privileges to so practice. For greater clarity, I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake not to practice Family Medicine in any capacity or at any location.

(b)	I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional encounters  ("Professional Encounter" or "Professional Encounters"), in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor" or "Practice Monitors"), and unless the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.

(c)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:

1.	providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 

2.	remaining present at all times during all Professional Encounters with all patients; 

3.	carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations. I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 

4.	refraining from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A", while observing me in all my Professional Encounters with patients; 

5.	maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the "Log") and in the manner described in Appendix "A", including confirming that notification of the patient has occurred in accordance with the requirements of section (10)(a) of this Undertaking;

6.	initialing all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log; and

7.	submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.

(d)	I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to make it available to the College upon request. 

(9)	I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(10)	Notifying Patients 

(a)	I, Dr. Nahvi, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I have a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, or as soon as practicable thereafter, of the details of the restrictions described in section (8)(b) above. For greater clarity, I may notify patients personally, or I may delegate this task to one of my College-approved Practice Monitors.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(11)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(12)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(13)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(14)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(15)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(16)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

(17)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(18)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Nahvi is the subject of College investigations into his practice, and has had charges laid against him under section 245 of the Criminal Code. During the investigations, and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal:

Dr. Nahvi has agreed to restrict his practice to Emergency Medicine.

Dr. Nahvi has agreed not engage in professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Nahvi's Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Nahvi must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

D.	CONSENT

(19)	I, Dr. Nahvi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(20)	I, Dr. Nahvi, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".

(21)	I, Dr. Nahvi, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and to the inspection of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(22)	I, Dr. Nahvi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Practice Monitors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(23)	I, Dr. Nahvi, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

(a)	relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A"; 

(c)	relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

(24)	I, Dr. Nahvi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.





Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 25, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shahab Nahvi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 25, 2021:
Dr. Nahvi is the subject of College investigations into his practice, and has had charges laid against him under section 245 of the Criminal Code. During the investigations, and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal:

Dr. Nahvi has agreed to restrict his practice to Emergency Medicine.

Dr. Nahvi has agreed not engage in professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Nahvi’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Nahvi must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: June 25, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES

Shahab Nahvi was charged with the following offence:

(1) Two counts of Administer Noxious Thing with Intent to Endanger Life, on or about May 21, 2021, contrary to Section 245(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: May 27, 2021
Place of charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: June 4, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On May 27, 2021, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Shahab Nahvi:

1. Notify specified officer of any change to address or employment.
2. Do not communicate directly or indirectly with specified person.
3. Do not go to places within 500 meters of anywhere the specified person lives, works, or is known to be.
4. Do not possess any weapons.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 18, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)