skip to content

Naaman, Saad Cyril

CPSO#: 96638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Jul 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Turkish

Education:University of Baghdad, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk ( CPSO# 90047 )
Dr. S. Naaman ( CPSO# 96638 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Phys Med and Rehabiliation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5184


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Saad  Cyril  Naaman  may practise medicine independently in physical
                  medicine and rehabilitation, only.

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.