skip to content

Morong, Sharon Elizabeth

CPSO#: 86642

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2630 Rutherford Road, Unit #200
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: (416) 548-4039
Fax: (647) 722-5440 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

7117 Bathurst Street, Unit #101
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-6222
Fax: (905) 597-4622
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

13291 Yonge Street, Unit #401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2025 Midland Avenue, Suite #302
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

24-2810 Major Mackenzie Dr. W
Vaughan ON  L6A 2C7
Canada
Phone: (289) 963-1644
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

20 Wynford Drive suite 103
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 4164412111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sharon Morong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morong ( CPSO# 86642 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (416) 548-4039

Business Address:
208 - 4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T7
Phone Number: (416) 292-3218

Business Address:
101 - 7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone Number: (905) 597-6222

Business Address:
Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Business Address:
103-20 Wynford Drive
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 441-2111

Business Address:
B24 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 3L2
Phone Number: (289) 963-1644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH MORONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013