skip to content

Moffatt, Susan Lindsay

CPSO#: 51223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Dec 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2332
Fax: (613) 549-1459 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moffatt Brison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Brison ( CPSO# 31153 )
Dr. S. Moffatt ( CPSO# 51223 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN LINDSAY MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1986