skip to content

Mithoowani, Siraj

CPSO#: 100474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hematology
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Bldg, F301
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36024
Fax: 905-540-6568 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohamed Mithoowani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 27305 )
Dr. H. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 98344 )
Dr. S. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 100474)

Business Address:
17 Frank Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 245-3370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIRAJ MITHOOWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITHOOWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2018