skip to content

Misra, Shikha

CPSO#: 100947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7899 McLaughlin Rd
Suite C210
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H9
Phone: (905) 459-7533 Ext. 5153
Fax: (905) 874-4388 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Central Pky W
Unit 21
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Canada
Phone: 905-270-0587
Fax: 905-848-1736
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chaudhry & Misra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 96236 )
Dr. S. Misra ( CPSO# 100947)

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 319
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8778

Business Address:
7899 McLaughlin Road
Room C210
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H9
Phone Number: (905) 459-7533

Business Address:
325 Central Pkwy W, Unit 21
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X9
Phone Number: 905-270-0587

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIKHA MISRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015