Michael, Sameh William Ghaly (CPSO#: 104771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Suez Canal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4B - 754 Queenston Rd
Hamilton ON  L8G 1A4
Phone: (289) 389-9695
Fax: (289) 398-5359
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

36 Park Lawn RD
Unit 6
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 3H8
Canada
Phone: (289) 815-0052
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sameh Michael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Michael ( CPSO# 104771)

Business Address:
4B - 754 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8G 1A4
Phone Number: (289) 389-9695

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEH WILLIAM GHALY MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015