skip to content

Marqus, Sami Sabri

CPSO#: 73333

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1885 Glenanna Rd
internal medicine and metabolic cli
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: 9054929100
Fax: 18334395558 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3170 Eglinton ave. east.
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Canada
Phone: 4162652255
Fax: 4162656737
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sami Marqus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marqus ( CPSO# 73333 )

Business Address:
Suite 109 A + B
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone Number: (905) 492-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMI SABRI MARQUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARQUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 1999 to 31 May 1999
EL - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002