First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |