skip to content

Kurki, Sara

CPSO#: 94905

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Saint James School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Government Road East
Blanch River Health Kirkland Lake S
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kurki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurki ( CPSO# 94905 )

Business Address:
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Business Address:
Kirkland District Family Health Team
P.O. Box 10
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Blanche River Health Englehart
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA KURKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 19 Jun 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2011 to 27 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2013 to 14 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013