skip to content

Jalini, Shirin

CPSO#: 93619

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613- 549-6666 Ext. 6320 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nasirzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jalini ( CPSO# 93619 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIRIN JALINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2018