skip to content

Ibrahim, Sirar

CPSO#: 95631

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Al-Yahya, Sirar Kais Ibrahim (used until: 07 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pickering medical center
1885 Glennana road
Suite 207
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 492-0838
Fax: (905) 492-0327 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

108-4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 293-3233
Fax: 416.293.0692
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sirar Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 95631 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Suite 1J16
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
1733 Spruce Hill Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 1S3
Phone Number: 6478340709

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIRAR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
EL - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015