skip to content

Hussaini, Saira Niloufer

CPSO#: 99849

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu, Urdu

Education: Osmania University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk in
537 Van Kirk Drive, Unit 103
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone: 905-495-5550
Fax: 905-495-2624 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane Street
Unit 5
Toronto ON  M3M1A4
Canada
Phone: 416-249-8000
Fax: 416-249-4594
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hawthorne Place Care Centre
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 1M9
Canada
Phone: 416-745-0811 Ext. 450
Fax: 416-745-0568
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doctors Hussaini and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Waraich ( CPSO# 91784 )
Dr. S. Hussaini ( CPSO# 99849 )

Business Address:
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk-In
103 - 537 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 0P4
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550


Corporation Name: Dr. Saira N Hussaini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussaini ( CPSO# 99849 )

Business Address:
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk-In
103 - 537 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550

Business Address:
Hawthorne Place Nursing Care
2045 Finch Avenue
North York ON  M3N 1M9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active
 Dr.  Saira  Niloufer  Hussaini  may  practise  medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.