skip to content

Hosseini Moghaddam, Seyed Mohammadmehdi

CPSO#: 92031

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6835
Fax: 4163405442 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6835
Fax: 4163405351
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Seyed Hosseini-Moghaddam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hosseini Moghaddam ( CPSO# 92031 )

Business Address:
585 University Ave
UofT 9 MaRS-9078
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: 416 340 4800

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite B3-420
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective:29 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 18 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jun 2011
CF - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2011 to 01 Jan 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 31 May 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2017 Active
             Dr.  Seyed Mohammadmehdi Hosseini Moghaddam may practise medicine independently
            in infectious diseases.