skip to content

Gordner, Stuart

CPSO#: 27413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone: (416) 665-8515
Fax: (416) 661-9848 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart Gordner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gordner ( CPSO# 27413 )

Business Address:
202 - 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 665-8515

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc at 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 05 Dec 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STUART GORDNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975