skip to content

Gholizadeh-Ahangari, Shirin

CPSO#: 90908

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Kashan Univ. of Medical Sc & Health Serv, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 597-2528
Fax: (905) 597-2536 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

103 Parkway Forest Drive
Willowdale ON  M2J 1L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-7451
Fax: (416) 491-8008
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gholizadeh-Ahangari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gholizadeh-Ahangari ( CPSO# 90908 )

Business Address:
5 - 9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (905) 597-2528

Business Address:
103 Parkway Forest Drive
Suite 56
North York ON  M2J 1L8

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIRIN GHOLIZADEH-AHANGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLIZADEH-AHANGARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012