skip to content

Daya, Salim Haiderali

CPSO#: 31386

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Feb 2006
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:University of Manchester, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone: (905) 896-7100 Ext. 131
Fax: (905) 896-7200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

NewLife Fertility Centre
Unit 210
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 896-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Newlife Fertility Centre
670 Highway 7
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2
Canada
Phone: 905 886 7300
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Newlife Fertility Centre
8760 Jane Street
Building A
Suite 101
Concord ON  L4K 4V3
Canada
Phone: 905 896 7199 Ext. 830
Fax: 905 896 7299
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Salim Daya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daya ( CPSO# 31386 )

Business Address:
210 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5

Business Address:
103 - 7777 Kipling Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2Z3

Business Address:
8 - 670 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2

Business Address:
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone Number: (905) 896-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 22 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 May 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 09 May 2020 Active
 


            As from February 20, 2006, Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya undertakes to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

                  1.    (a)   I will not perform the Tompkins Metroplasty procedure;
                  
                        (b)   Prior to performing any other type of metroplasty, I will
                              obtain a second opinion, in writing, from a specialist
                              acceptable to the College that a metroplasty is indicated,
                              and that the metroplasty procedure that I propose to perform
                              is the appropriate one in the circumstances; and
                  
                        (c)   I intend to resume a gynaecology surgical practice and there
                              has been no recent assessment of my surgical skills.  Prior
                              to performing any unsupervised surgical procedures, I will
                              advise the College of my intention to do so and undergo an
                              evaluation and, if necessary on the basis of the evaluation,
                              training acceptable to the College.  I will ensure that the
                              most responsible physician is acceptable to the College.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Daya engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his infertility practice including his OHIP claims and delegation to non-physicians. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Daya will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Daya will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Daya’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)