Cunningham-Dunlop, Stephen Andrew (CPSO#: 103184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
785 Wonderland Road South
Suite 200
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: 519-641-6712
Fax: 519-641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 102376)
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANDREW CUNNINGHAM-DUNLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNNINGHAM-DUNLOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016