skip to content

Bryan, Susan Carol

CPSO#: 28991

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education: McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Susan Bryan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bryan ( CPSO# 28991 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 345-6446

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

143 Summit Avenue,
Thunder Bay, Ontario.
P7B 3P2
Date Received: 20 May 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022