skip to content

Brook, Shelley Carolyn

CPSO#: 53188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
17th Floor Room 17056
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3859
Fax: (416) 864-5480 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Street East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-6315
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Brook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brook ( CPSO# 53188 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 17th Floor
Room 17056
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060


Corporation Name: Donald A. Wasylenki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wasylenki ( CPSO# 25087 )
Dr. S. Brook ( CPSO# 53188 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
17th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHELLEY CAROLYN BROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1983