skip to content

Bilgasem, Solieman Ahmed H

CPSO#: 76910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200A
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-1963
Fax: (705) 673-8676 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Solieman Bilgasem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bilgasem ( CPSO# 76910 )

Business Address:
Suite 200A
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 673-1963

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOLIEMAN AHMED H BILGASEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILGASEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.