skip to content

Arshinoff, Steve Aaron

CPSO#: 29818

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Mar 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Baylor College of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Finch Eye Associates
Suite 316
2115 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 745-6969
Fax: (416) 745-6724 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uptown Eye Specialists
Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-0330
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Steve A. Arshinoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arshinoff ( CPSO# 29818 )

Business Address:
York Finch Eye Associates
Suite 316
2115 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 745-6969

Business Address:
38 Blue Forest Drive
Toronto ON  M3H 4W5

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
Uptown Eye Specialist
Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5

Business Address:
CNIB Medical Eye Care Unit
303 York Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 2A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVE AARON ARSHINOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARSHINOFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1978
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.