skip to content

Ryzhak, Oleh Mykolayovych

CPSO#: 85052

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Chernovzy Medical Institute, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 304
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone: (905) 713-1300
Fax: (905) 713-1302 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

8707 Dufferin Street, Unit 3
Vaughan ON  L4J 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905 747 0808
Fax: 905 881 1551
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9600 Bathurst Street, Suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: 416 588 3788
Fax: 416 588 5633
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3292 Bayview Avenue, Unit 302
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: 416 223-7500
Fax: 416 590 1515
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 7451
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLEH MYKOLAYOVYCH RYZHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYZHAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010