Rys, Trisha Marie (CPSO#: 98482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
316 king street east
Cobourg Ontario suite 203 K9A5R8
Cobourg ON  K9A5R8
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Trisha Rys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rys ( CPSO# 98482 )

Business Address:
203-316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone Number: (905) 373-1280

Business Address:
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHA MARIE RYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014