skip to content

Rydz, Natalia

CPSO#: 87577

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
EL - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013