skip to content

Ryan, Edward Anthony Joseph

CPSO#: 27400

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Jul 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4
Phone: (416) 231-4100
Fax: (416) 231-0845 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

CREATE Fertility center
11th Floor 790 Bay street
Toronto ON  W5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CREATE Fertility center
11th Floor 790 Bay street
Toronto ON  W5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 Jul 2019 Active
 
            As from July 3, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.  Edward Anthony
            Joseph Ryan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ryan to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                    DR. EDWARD ANTHONY JOSEPH RYAN
                                             ("Dr. Ryan")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ryan, certificate of registration number 27400, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that as a result of an undertaking that I
                  entered into on July 14, 2016, I underwent remediation and submitted to a
                  reassessment of my practice.  The reassessment report received by the
                  College raised concerns about my standard of practice in fertility.    

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for at least
                        seven (7) months ("Clinical Supervision"), on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will be reduced only upon recommendation
                        of the Clinical Supervisor and approval by the College.  
                  
                  High Level Supervision
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that initially I will practice under a high
                        level of supervision ("High Level Supervision") for at least one
                        (1) month on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake and acknowledge that during High Level
                        Supervision:
                  
                        (i)   I will not be the Most Responsible Physician ("MRP") for any
                              patient care;
                        (ii)  The Clinical Supervisor will be the MRP for all patient care
                              and encounters and the Clinical Supervisor must be available
                              at all times to review treatment plans;
                        (iii) I will not implement any treatment plan with respect to any
                              patient without prior review and approval by the Clinical
                              Supervisor; and
                        (iv)  The Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at least once per
                              week to review, and discuss with me the Clinical Supervisor's
                              review of, at least fifteen (15) patient charts to assess for
                              the quality of documentation and care.  This review will
                              include:  
                  
                              1.    A review of all cycle monitoring and patient
                                    interactions;
                              2.    An interview with me;
                              3.    Interview(s) with other stakeholders, such as my
                                    colleagues and co-workers, if the Clinical Supervisor
                                    deems it necessary or appropriate; and
                              4.    Direct observation of my patient interactions.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that after a minimum of one (1) month of
                        High Level Supervision, if the Clinical Supervisor is satisfied
                        that I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to
                        practice in a less highly supervised environment, the Clinical
                        Supervisor may recommend to the College that supervision be
                        reduced.
                  
            Moderate Level Supervision

                  (f)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval by
                        the College, I Dr. Ryan, undertake that I will practice under a
                        moderate level of supervision ("Moderate Level Supervision") for at
                        least six (6) months on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake and acknowledge that during Moderate Level
                        Supervision:
                  
                        (i)   I will be the MRP for patient care; and
                        (ii)  The Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at least once per
                              week to review, and discuss with me the Clinical Supervisor's
                              review of, at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts to
                              assess for the quality of documentation and care.  This
                              review will include:  
                  
                                    1.    A review of all cycle monitoring and patient
                                          interactions;
                                    2.    An interview with me;
                                    3.    Interview(s) with other stakeholders, such as my
                                          colleagues and co-workers, if the Clinical
                                          Supervisor deems it necessary or appropriate; and
                                    4.    Direct observation of my patient interactions, if
                                          the Clinical Supervisor deems it necessary or
                                          appropriate.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months of
                        Moderate Level Supervision, if the Clinical Supervisor is satisfied
                        that I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to
                        practice without Clinical Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor may
                        recommend to the College that Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge and undertake that Clinical Supervision
                        will cease only upon recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and
                        approval by the College.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. In addition
                        to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                              (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                                    Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto
                                    as Appendix "B";
                              (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have
                                    an initial meeting with me to discuss practice
                                    improvement recommendations;
                              (iii) Discuss any concerns with me arising from the chart
                                    reviews and observations;
                              (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements
                                    and ongoing professional development and inquire into
                                    my compliance with the recommendations; 
                              (v)   Maintain a log of all patient charts reviewed along
                                    with patient identifiers; 
                              (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other
                                    documents or conducting interviews with staff or
                                    colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
                              (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once
                                    every month, or more frequently if the Clinical
                                    Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated
                        December 17, 2018 and the letter from the assessor dated February
                        12, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that all meetings with the Clinical
                        Supervisor will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(n) and/or
                        (o) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (5)(p) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Ryan underwent remediation and a reassessment of his practice
                        in fertility.  The reassessment report raised concerns about Dr.
                        Ryan's standard of practice in fertility.  As a result of the
                        reassessment:
                  
                              Dr. Ryan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 7 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Ryan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 3, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Edward Anthony Joseph Ryan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 3, 2019:

Dr. Ryan underwent remediation and a reassessment of his practice in fertility. The reassessment report raised concerns about Dr. Ryan’s standard of practice in fertility. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Ryan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 7 months.

Dr. Ryan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.