skip to content

Ryan, Edward Anthony Joseph

CPSO#: 27400

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4
Phone: (416) 231-4100
Fax: (416) 231-0845 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD ANTHONY JOSEPH RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2021