skip to content

Ruzickova, Martina

CPSO#: 94210

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Abenaki Rd
Truro NS  B2N 5A1
Phone: 902 897 4357
Fax: 902 895 5829

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:10 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTINA RUZICKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUZICKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Oct 2010
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014