skip to content

Ruzhynsky, Jennifer Lynn

CPSO#: 95875

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vladimir Ruzhynsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 08 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 08 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2017