skip to content

Rutherford, Suzanne Louise

CPSO#: 85172

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Crossing Family Health
Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-0100 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Suzanne L. Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rutherford ( CPSO# 85172 )

Business Address:
Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUZANNE LOUISE RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009