skip to content

Rutherford, Paul Allan

CPSO#: 19820

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947 Electoral District: 02

Medical Records Location

Address: Fisher Primary Care Centre 185 Inkerman St E Listowel, ON N4W 2N1
Date Received: 07 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019