skip to content

Rusthoven, James Jacob

CPSO#: 28987

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Illinois, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brantford General Hospital 200 Terrace Hill St Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Date Received: 06 Mar 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 2020