skip to content

Rustad, Jennifer Anne

CPSO#: 89016

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 506
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: 4162292201 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 4167566000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE RUSTAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSTAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2011