skip to content

Russo, Miguel Angel

CPSO#: 97676

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Dundas St West
#700
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone: 416-586-4748 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. MIGUEL RUSSO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wigle ( CPSO# 97589 )
Dr. M. Russo ( CPSO# 97676 )

Business Address:
250 Dundas St W
7th floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5

Business Address:
1-800 Southdown Rd
Suite A-4
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:03 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIGUEL ANGEL RUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 03 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019