skip to content

Russo, Juan Jose

CPSO#: 95412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Juan J. Russo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Russo ( CPSO# 95412 )

Business Address:
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7329

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUAN JOSE RUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2017