skip to content

Russell, Sarah Ashley

CPSO#: 101101

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: 613-938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH ASHLEY RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018