skip to content

Russell, Neville Anderson

CPSO#: 20578

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010