skip to content

Russell, Luke Anthony Jacobs

CPSO#: 95375

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
Emergency Department
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 429-6975
Fax: (519) 429-6998 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Russell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Russell ( CPSO# 95375 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
Emergency Department
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 429-6975

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKE ANTHONY JACOBS RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013