skip to content

Rusen, David Samuel

CPSO#: 30220

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 7, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise undertaking given by Dr. David Samuel Rusen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 7, 2015: Dr. Rusen has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.