skip to content

Ruppel, Rachel

CPSO#: 98367

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Vale, Rachel (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1243 Islington Ave
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 231-0100 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rachel Ruppel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ruppel ( CPSO# 98367 )

Business Address:
1000 - 1243 Islington Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 231-0100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:19 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL RUPPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPPEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017