skip to content

Rupert, Raymond Howard

CPSO#: 25597

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1006 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2K8
Phone: (416) 483-2858
Fax: (416) 483-5576 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raymond Howard Rupert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rupert ( CPSO# 25597 )

Business Address:
1006 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2K8
Phone Number: (416) 483-2858

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Jun 2019 Active
             As from June 13, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raymond Howard
            Rupert in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rupert to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. RAYMOND HOWARD RUPERT
                                            ("Dr. Rupert")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached as Schedule "A"; and the
                  current regulatory lists are attached as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C". 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Patient" means an individual who attends upon Dr. Rupert as a treating
                  physician
                  for the purpose of the assessment of a physical or mental condition and
                  the
                  diagnosis, treatment and prevention of any disease, disorder or
                  dysfunction.
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rupert, certificate of registration number 25597, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 7214662, 7215380 and 7215382 (the "Investigations")
                  into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent
                  in my general family medicine practice, including my travel medicine and
                  addiction medicine practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person in regards to each of the Investigations.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Maintenance of Logs

                  Log of Uninsured Services 
                  
                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to keep a log of all uninsured services I
                        provide to patients, as set out in the form attached as Schedule
                        "D", which will include at least the following information
                        ("Uninsured Services Log"):
                  
                        (i)   the date of the patient appointment;
                        (ii)  the name(s) of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the uninsured services provided;
                        (iv)  the amount billed;
                        (v)   the clinical indication;
                        (vi)  Dr. Rupert's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and 
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below). 
                  
                  Log of Case Management Services
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to keep a log of all case management
                        services I provide as set out in the form attached as Schedule "E",
                        which will include at least the following information ("Case
                        Management Services Log"):
                  
                        (i)   the time frame in which the case management services were
                              provided;
                        (ii)  the name(s) of the client;
                        (iii) summary of the case management service provided;
                        (iv)  indication for which the case management service is provided;
                        (v)   the amount billed;
                        (vi)  Dr. Rupert's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as
                               out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out
                              below).
                  Prescribing Log 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to keep a log of all prescriptions for
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs, in the form attached as Schedule "F", which will
                        include at least the following information ("Prescribing Log"): 
                  
                        (i)   the date of the patient encounter;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency; 
                        (iv)  the clinical indication; 
                        (v)   Dr. Rupert's signature; 
                        (vi)  the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and 
                        (vii) the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below). 
                  
            (7)   Practice Restrictions 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        restrict my practice to general family medicine and case management
                        consulting through Rupert Case Management (RCM). For greater
                        clarity, my practice will not include:
                  
                        (i)   addiction medicine in an acute care setting; 
                        (ii)  travel medicine; and
                        (iii) the performance or delegation of any controlled acts (as
                              defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 and the
                              Medicine Act, 1991) through RCM.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that all patient encounters by me shall
                        take place in person, with the exception of the eight (8) existing
                        patients in my general family medicine practice who currently
                        receive my services through the use of the Ontario Telemedicine
                        Network.  For greater certainty, this restriction does not prohibit
                        my use of the telephone to contact my family practice patients for
                        administrative purposes, provided such communication does not
                        entail the assessment, diagnosis or treatment of a medical
                        condition.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake not to delegate any controlled acts in my
                        family practice, nor shall I permit individuals who are not
                        regulated health professionals to conduct assessments, take
                        histories, or conduct physical examinations of patients. 

                  (d)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that I shall not provide any services
                        through RCM that would be covered by OHIP as an insured service as
                        defined by the Health Insurance Act, R.S.O. 1990, c. H.6 and the
                        Schedule of Benefits: Physicians Services under the Health
                        Insurance Act, as amended from time to time.
                  
            (8)   Posting a sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                        location, in the form attached as Schedule "G". For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Rupert's practice
                        is restricted to general family medicine and case management
                        consulting through Rupert Case Management, and does not include
                        addiction medicine in an acute care setting or travel medicine. All
                        patient encounters with Dr. Rupert must occur in person. Further
                        information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                        of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca". 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) in all waiting rooms of my practice locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "G". 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language 
                        described in section (8)(d).   
                  
            (9)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        a minimum of nine (9) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached as Schedule "H", and understand
                        what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical
                        Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached as Schedule
                              "I";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for at
                              least three (3) months;
                        (iv)  After a minimum of three (3) months of supervision, if my
                              Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a
                              reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor
                              will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another
                              location approved by the College, once every month for a
                              further six (6) months;
                        (v)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, which shall include a minimum of five to ten (5-10)
                              charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                              Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs since
                              the Clinical Supervisor's last review;
                        (vi)  Review all entries in my Uninsured Services Log and Case
                              Management Services Log;
                        (vii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart and log reviews;
                        (viii)Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (ix)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (x)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached as Schedule "I", as well as the
                        areas of concern identified in the reports of the medical
                        inspectors, dated August 16, 2017, August 22, 2017, September 11,
                        2017, and June 19, 2018, and any concerns that arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "H" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to ensure that Schedule "H" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within twenty
                        (20) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "H" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out in sections (9)(e) and/or (f)
                        above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (9)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (10)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached as Schedule "I",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   the University of Toronto's Safer Opioid Prescribing program; 
                        (ii)  the University of Toronto's Medical Record-Keeping course; 
                        (iii) PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing
                              evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.
                              I, Dr. Rupert, will agree to abide by any recommendations of
                              the PROBE program;
                        (iv)  completion of self-study as outlined in the IEP; and
                        (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (11)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (9)
                        above and Schedule "H" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review,
                        and may include direct observation of my care, an interview with
                        me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted 
                        under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (12)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of the Effective Date.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake to inform the College of the names and
                        birthdates of the eight (8) patients to whom I provide care and
                        treatment via the Ontario Telemedicine Network, as set out in
                        section (7)(b) above, within five (5) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rupert, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rupert, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached as Schedule "J" and Schedule "K",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (18)  I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rupert, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Three College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Rupert
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        family medicine practice, including in his travel medicine and
                        addiction medicine practice.  As a result of the investigations:
                  
                              Dr. Rupert's practice is restricted to general family
                              medicine and case management consulting through Rupert Case
                              Management (RCM). He will not engage in travel medicine.
                  
                              Dr. Rupert will not engage in addiction medicine in an acute
                              care setting.
                  
                              Dr. Rupert will have patient encounters in person only, with
                              a limited exception for 8 existing patients. 
                  
                              Dr. Rupert shall not delegate any controlled acts (as defined
                              in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 and the
                              Medicine Act, 1991) in his family practice, nor permit any
                              individual who is not a regulated health professional to
                              conduct assessments, take histories, or conduct physical
                              examinations of patients.  
                  
                              Dr. Rupert will not perform or delegate controlled acts (as
                              defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 and the
                              Medicine Act, 1991) through RCM, nor shall he perform
                              services through RCM that would be covered by OHIP.
                  
                              Dr. Rupert will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months.
                  
                              Dr. Rupert will engage in professional education, including
                              in opioid prescribing, record-keeping, and ethics.
                  
                              Dr. Rupert's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College approximately 6 months after the end
                              of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Rupert, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Rupert, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Rupert, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Schedule "H" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Raymond Howard Rupert to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 13, 2019:

Three College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Rupert engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice, including in his travel medicine and addiction medicine practice. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Rupert’s practice is restricted to general family medicine and case management consulting through Rupert Case Management (RCM). He will not engage in travel medicine.

Dr. Rupert will not engage in addiction medicine in an acute care setting.

Dr. Rupert will have patient encounters in person only, with a limited exception for 8 existing patients.

Dr. Rupert shall not delegate any controlled acts (as defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 and the Medicine Act, 1991) in his family practice, nor permit any individual who is not a regulated health professional to conduct assessments, take histories, or conduct physical examinations of patients.

Dr. Rupert will not perform or delegate controlled acts (as defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 and the Medicine Act, 1991) through RCM, nor shall he perform services through RCM that would be covered by OHIP.

Dr. Rupert will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months.

Dr. Rupert will engage in professional education, including in opioid prescribing, record-keeping, and ethics.

Dr. Rupert’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)