skip to content

Ruparelia, Raj

CPSO#: 94481

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502 - 345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raj Ruparelia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ruparelia ( CPSO# 94481 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 845-4511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJ RUPARELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPARELIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012