skip to content

Ruparelia, Meera

CPSO#: 87405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
111-100 Strowger Blvd
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone: 613-345-0918
Fax: 613-345-0865 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meera Ruparelia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ruparelia ( CPSO# 87405 )

Business Address:
111-100 Strowger Blvd
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone Number: 613-345-0918

Business Address:
203 - 309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone Number: (613) 345-0918

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEERA RUPARELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPARELIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008