skip to content

Rumble, Edward John

CPSO#: 25769

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
188 Prideaux Street
Box 1417
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Phone: 2899688355 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E.J. Rumble Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rumble ( CPSO# 25769 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD JOHN RUMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUMBLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973