skip to content

Rukholm, Gavin Arne

CPSO#: 88649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
361 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R2
Phone: (705) 749-9262 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gavin Rukholm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rukholm ( CPSO# 88649 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
361 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R2
Phone Number: (705) 749-9262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAVIN ARNE RUKHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUKHOLM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013