skip to content

Bromberg, Rudy Mishael

CPSO#: 94834

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Enhanced Care Clinic, Thornhill
7335 Yonge St, Unit A&C
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone: (905) 707-7309
Fax: (888) 979-6305 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Enhanced Care Clinic
14872 Yonge St.
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Canada
Phone: 9055050950
Fax: 9058419404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rudy M. Bromberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bromberg ( CPSO# 94834 )

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Unit A & C
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Jan 2020 Active
 (1 of 2)

As from April 19, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rudy Mishael Bromberg  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bromberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. RUDY MISHAEL BROMBERG
("Dr. Bromberg")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Bromberg, certificate of registration number 94834, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that following a report that raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about my standard of practice.  I subsequently restricted my practice, underwent further remediation and submitted to a further reassessment of my practice.  The reassessment report subsequently received by the College in File Number 1111240 continued to raise concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine.

(4)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I entered into a previous Undertaking with the College on January 6, 2020 (the "2020 Undertaking") and that the provisions of the 2020 Undertaking remain in force, with the exception of those provisions pertaining to Clinical Supervision and Reassessment.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit a written report to the College upon completion of the Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated December 29, 2020, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module, CMPA: www.cmpa-acpm.ca/serve/elearning/documentation/en/index.html;

(ii)	Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following resources:   
         
1.	2018 and 2020 Diabetes Guideline, Diabetes Canada: http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/fullguidelines;

2.	2020 Hypertension Canada Prevention and Treatment Guidelines, Hypertension Canada: http://guidelines.hypertension.ca/prevention-treatment/;

3.	Medical Records Documentation, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical-Records-Documentation;

4.	Medical Records Management, CPSO: www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical-Records-Management

(iii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months of the date I sign this Undertaking or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(9)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C. 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(12)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(14)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(15)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(16)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Bromberg entered into an Undertaking in January 2020 to restrict his practice, undergo remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice.  The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine.  As a result:

Dr. Bromberg will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 

Dr. Bromberg will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues.

Dr. Bromberg's practice will be reassessed again by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

(c)	I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(17)	I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)	I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;

(c)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(e)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

As from January 6, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rudy Mishael Bromberg  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bromberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
                  
of
                  
DR. RUDY MISHAEL BROMBERG
("Dr. Bromberg")
                  
to 
                  
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
                  
A.    PREAMBLE

(1)   In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
                  
"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
                  
"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
                  
(2)   I, Dr. Bromberg, certificate of registration number 94834, am a member of the College.  

(3)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that following the receipt of a reassessment report that raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1109701 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

B.    UNDERTAKING

(4)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

(a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").

(b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for, or administer, any of the following substances:
                  
(i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19);

(ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 

(iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "B"; and links to the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "C")

(v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, with a link to the current regulatory list attached hereto as Schedule "D");
                  
and as amended from time to time.
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to immediately refer all patients to whom I am prescribing any of the substances described in section (c), above, to other physicians for assessment and care.
                  
(e)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log"). I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to include in the Log the name of each patient referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the date of referral. 

(6)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy "Prescribing Drugs."

(7)   Posting a Sign

(a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E".  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Bromberg must not prescribe or administer any of the following: 
-     Narcotic Drugs
-     Narcotic Preparations
-     Controlled Drugs
-     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-     Monitored Drugs
                  
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (7)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." 

(c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
(e)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (7)(c) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).
                  
(8)   Clinical Supervision 

(a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "F", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
(i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Schedule "G";
                  
(ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;
                  
(iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;
                  
(v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
(vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
 (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "G", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated January 1, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Schedule "F" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to ensure that Schedule "F" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
(f)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Schedule "F" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                        
(h)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(9)   Reassessment of Practice

(a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8) above and Schedule "F" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review, interview with me, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
(10)  Monitoring 

(a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
                        
(b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)   I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "H" and Schedule "I", respectively. 

C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(11)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(12)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(13)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(14)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(15)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(16)  I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(17)  Public Register

(a)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Bromberg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a reassessment of his practice, a College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bromberg engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation: 
                  
Dr. Bromberg must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for, or administer, any of the following substances:
                  
(i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                              
(iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 

(v)   Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);   

and as amended from time to time.
                  
Dr. Bromberg must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
Dr. Bromberg must not prescribe or administer any of the following: 
                  
-     Narcotic Drugs
-     Narcotic Preparations
-     Controlled Drugs
-     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-     Monitored Drugs
                  
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
Dr. Bromberg will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 
                  
Dr. Bromberg's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
D.    CONSENT

(18)  I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

(a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
                  
(b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
                  
(c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
(19)  I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(20)  I, Dr. Bromberg, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
(b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Schedule "F" to this Undertaking;
                  
(c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
(d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
(e)   any information which comes to their attention which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 19, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rudy Mishael Bromberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 19, 2021:

Dr. Bromberg entered into an Undertaking in January 2020 to restrict his practice, undergo remediation and submit to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result:

Dr. Bromberg will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Bromberg will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues.

Dr. Bromberg’s practice will be reassessed again by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rudy Mishael Bromberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2020:

Following a reassessment of his practice, a College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Bromberg engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Bromberg must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for, or administer, any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Bromberg must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Bromberg must not prescribe or administer any of the following:

- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Dr. Bromberg will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Bromberg’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.