skip to content

Rudovics, Andrejs

CPSO#: 95032

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: 5194915907
Fax: 5194916187 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rudovics Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rudovics ( CPSO# 95032 )

Business Address:
107 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 491-5907

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREJS RUDOVICS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDOVICS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Colorectal Surgery

University Of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 03 Feb 2012
EL - General Surgery

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
EL - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013