skip to content

Ruderman, Caroline

CPSO#: 100920

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3099 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Caroline Ruderman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ruderman ( CPSO# 100920)

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLINE RUDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2015